ME LD446 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Appropriate Funds to the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry To Maintain Snowmobile Trails
Title
An Act To Appropriate Funds to the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry To Maintain Snowmobile Trails
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Sen. Michael Carpenter [D] | Sen. James Dill [D] | Sen. Louis Luchini [D] |
Rep. Roland Martin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-04-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-53). |
2019-04-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-04-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-53). |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-53) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-01-29 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-29 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |