ME LD474 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Establish a Medically Tailored Food Pilot Project
Title
Resolve, To Establish a Medically Tailored Food Pilot Project
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Sanborn [D] | Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D] | Rep. Brian Hubbell [D] |
Sen. Marianne Moore [R] | Sen. Teresa Pierce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2019-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-18 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-04-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-16 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-36). |
2019-04-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-04-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-36). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-36) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-01-29 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-29 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |