ME LD509 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase the Minimum Grant Amount under the Maine State Grant Program
Title
An Act To Increase the Minimum Grant Amount under the Maine State Grant Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-468) in concurrence |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-468) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator HERBIG of Waldo the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-468). |
2019-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-06 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-468) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-06 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-06 | House | On motion of Representative DAUGHTRY of Brunswick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-06 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator Herbig of Waldo, REFERRED to the Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business, in concurrence. |
2019-01-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-31 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed. |