ME LD53 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify Local Referendum Ballots
Title
An Act To Clarify Local Referendum Ballots
Sponsors
Sen. Heather Sanborn [D] | Rep. Barbara Cardone [D] | Sen. Ned Claxton [D] | Rep. Edward Crockett [D] |
Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D] | Rep. Erik Jorgensen [D] | Sen. Nathan Libby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-04-18 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-41). |
2019-04-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-04-18 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-41). |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-41) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-01-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock REFERENCE to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed |