ME LD548 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Charging a Person under 18 Years of Age with the Crime of Engaging in Prostitution
Title
An Act Regarding Charging a Person under 18 Years of Age with the Crime of Engaging in Prostitution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #56 (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-04-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-48). |
2019-04-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-48) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-04-30 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-04-30 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-30 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-48) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-48) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-04-25 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 56 Yeas 26 - Nays 7 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator DOW of Lincoln TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report . |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report . |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-01-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |