ME LD549 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Promote Academic Achievement through Hunger Relief for Maine Children

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Promote Academic Achievement through Hunger Relief for Maine Children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateIn possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
2019-05-07SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-02HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-04-30HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-30HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-57).
2019-04-30HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-04-30HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-04-25SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2019-04-25SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-57).
2019-04-25SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-57) READ and ADOPTED.
2019-04-25SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-04-25SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2019-01-31HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-31HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
2019-01-31SenateCommittee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback