ME LD550 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Definition of "Subdivision" in the Laws Governing Planning and Land Use Regulation for Subdivisions and a Provision Excepting the Division of a New or Existing Structure from Those Laws Beginning July 1, 2018
Title
An Act To Amend the Definition of "Subdivision" in the Laws Governing Planning and Land Use Regulation for Subdivisions and a Provision Excepting the Division of a New or Existing Structure from Those Laws Beginning July 1, 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Libby [D] | Rep. Richard Campbell [R] | Sen. Robert Foley [R] | Rep. Erik Jorgensen [D] |
Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R] | Rep. Ralph Tucker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-21 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-97). |
2019-05-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-97). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-97) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-01-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |