ME LD613 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Concerning the Adoption of Rules To Carry Out the Purpose of the Bridging Rental Assistance Program
Title
Resolve, Concerning the Adoption of Rules To Carry Out the Purpose of the Bridging Rental Assistance Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-23 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-16 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2019-05-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2019-02-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-05 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |