ME LD640 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, To Require a Study of Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reductions from the Proposed Central Maine Power Company Transmission Corridor

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, To Require a Study of Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reductions from the Proposed Central Maine Power Company Transmission Corridor

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - House - Recede And Concur - Emer RC #184 (Y: 74 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-06-04 - House - Final Passage - Emer RC #177 (Y: 77 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-06-03 - House - Reconsider RC #172 (Y: 52 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-06-03 - House - Table Until Later RC #171 (Y: 84 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Adopt Hah-345 To Cas-82 RC #118 (Y: 87 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #117 (Y: 74 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #89 (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07SenatePlaced in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2019-06-07SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate INSISTED To FINAL PASSAGE
2019-06-06HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-06HouseSubsequently, The House INSISTED on its previous action whereby the bill FAILED FINAL PASSAGE
2019-06-06HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken.
2019-06-06HouseROLL CALL NO. 184 (Yeas 74 - Nays 65 - Absent 9 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-06-06HouseMotion to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED
2019-06-05SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2019-06-05SenateFINALLY PASSED - 2/3 Elected Required, in NON-CONCURRENCE.
2019-06-04HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-04HouseROLL CALL NO. 177 (Yeas 77 - Nays 66 - Absent 5 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-06-04HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken.
2019-06-04HouseSubsequently, FAILED FINAL PASSAGE.
2019-06-04HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-06-03HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-03HouseROLL CALL NO. 172 (Yeas 52 - Nays 89 - Absent 7 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-06-03HouseSubsequently, the motion to RECONSIDER FAILED.
2019-06-03HouseRepresentative FAULKINGHAM or Winter Harbormoved that the House RECONSIDER its action whereby the Resolve was TABLED
2019-06-03HouseROLL CALL NO. 171 (Yeas 84 - Nays 54 - Absent 10 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-06-03HouseLater today assigned.
2019-06-03HouseOn motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE.
2019-05-30SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-82) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-345) in concurrence
2019-05-30SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-05-29SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-28SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-28SenateOn motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
2019-05-23HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-23HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2019-05-23HouseThe Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-82) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-345) thereto.
2019-05-23HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-05-23HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-82) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-345) thereto was ADOPTED.
2019-05-23HouseROLL CALL NO. 118 (Yeas 87 - Nays 50 - Absent 11 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-05-23HouseOn motion of Representative HANDY of Lewiston, House Amendment "A" (H-345) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-82) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-05-23HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-82) was READ.
2019-05-23HouseThe Resolve was READ ONCE.
2019-05-23HouseROLL CALL NO. 117 (Yeas 74 - Nays 64 - Absent 10 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-05-23HouseSubsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-05-23HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-05-21HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-16HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-16HouseLater today assigned.
2019-05-16HouseOn further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2019-05-16HouseRepresentative TUCKER of Brunswick moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2019-05-16HouseReports READ.
2019-05-14SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-05-14SenateRELEASED.
2019-05-09SenateHELD at the Request of Senator TIMBERLAKE of Androscoggin.
2019-05-09SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-82)
2019-05-09SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-82) READ and ADOPTED
2019-05-09SenateREAD ONCE
2019-05-09SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 89 Yeas 30 - Nays 4 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2019-05-09SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2019-05-09SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-05-08SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-07SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-07SenateOn motion by Senator TIMBERLAKE of Androscoggin TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator CARSON of Cumberland to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report .
2019-05-07SenateSenator CARSON of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report .
2019-05-07SenateReports READ
2019-02-07HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-07HouseThe Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
2019-02-07SenateOn motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2019-02-07SenateCommittee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=640&snum=129
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0202&item=1&snum=129
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0202&item=2&snum=129
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0202&item=7&snum=129
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071595&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=89
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071595&chamber=House&serialnumber=117
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071595&chamber=House&serialnumber=118
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071595&chamber=House&serialnumber=171
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071595&chamber=House&serialnumber=172
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071595&chamber=House&serialnumber=177
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071595&chamber=House&serialnumber=184

Bill Comments

feedback