ME LD665 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 4 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 4 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Office of the Attorney General To Review Free Speech on Public College and University Campuses
Title
Resolve, Directing the Office of the Attorney General To Review Free Speech on Public College and University Campuses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #181 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #164 (Y: 87 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #164 (Y: 87 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN, L. of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-05 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-395) in concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-395) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-04 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 181 Yeas 20 - Nays 14 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended By Committee Amendment "A" (H-395) Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-395). |
2019-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-03 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-395) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-03 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-03 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 164 (Yeas 87 - Nays 51 - Absent 10 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-06-03 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-03 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-02-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |