ME LD671 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Require Professional Licensure for Home Inspectors
Title
Resolve, To Require Professional Licensure for Home Inspectors
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Kessler [D] | Rep. Shawn Babine [D] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Rep. Victoria Doudera [D] |
Rep. Daniel Hobbs [D] | Rep. Brian Hubbell [D] | Sen. Henry Ingwersen [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #97 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #90 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #83 (Y: 73 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #90 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #83 (Y: 73 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-23 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 97 Yeas 20 - Nays 14 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-223) in concurrence |
2019-05-16 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-16 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-223). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 90 Yeas 18 - Nays 16 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator HERBIG of Waldo the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-05-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-223). |
2019-05-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-223) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-09 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 83 (Yeas 73 - Nays 67 - Absent 9 - Excused 1 Vacant 1) |
2019-05-09 | House | On motion of Representative DAUGHTRY of Brunswick, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS in concurrence |
2019-02-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business suggested and ordered printed. |