ME LD701 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Modernize the National School Lunch Program and the School Breakfast Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Modernize the National School Lunch Program and the School Breakfast Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-19HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-19HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-19HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-19HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-139) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-329) thereto.
2019-06-19SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-19SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-139) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-329) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-06-19SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-139) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-329) thereto ADOPTED
2019-06-19SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-329) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-139) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-19SenateUnder further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-139) was ADOPTED
2019-06-19SenateUnder suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-139)
2019-06-19SenateOn Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2019-06-03SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2019-05-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-30HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-30HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2019-05-29HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-29HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-139).
2019-05-29HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-05-29HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-05-28SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2019-05-28SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-139).
2019-05-28SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-139) READ and ADOPTED.
2019-05-28SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-05-28SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2019-02-12HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-12HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
2019-02-12SenateCommittee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback