ME LD716 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Railroad Freight Safety
Title
An Act To Increase Railroad Freight Safety
Sponsors
Rep. Deane Rykerson [D] | Rep. Betty Austin [D] | Rep. Benjamin Collings [D] | Sen. Nathan Libby [D] |
Rep. Bruce White [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #218 (Y: 89 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - Reconsider RC #217 (Y: 86 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - Reconsider RC #217 (Y: 86 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-10 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 218 (Yeas 89 - Nays 54 - Absent 6 - Excused 1 Vacant 1) |
2019-06-10 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-10 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 217 (Yeas 86 - Nays 56 - Absent 7 - Excused 1 Vacant 1) |
2019-06-10 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-10 | House | On motion of Representative McLEAN of Gorham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-10 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-07 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2019-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2019-02-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2019-02-12 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |