ME LD748 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Provide Relief to Survivors of Economic Abuse

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Provide Relief to Survivors of Economic Abuse

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-14HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-14SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-06-14SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-585), in concurrence.
2019-06-14SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-585) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-14SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-06-14SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-13HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-585).
2019-06-13HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-06-13HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-02-12SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
2019-02-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-12HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2019-02-12HouseCommittee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback