ME LD75 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Protect Earned Pay

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Protect Earned Pay

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #19 (Y: 86 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #25 (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateSubsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2019-06-18SenateOn Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2019-04-02SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-03-28HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-28HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-03-26HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-26HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-11).
2019-03-26HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-03-26HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-11) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-03-26HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-03-26HouseROLL CALL NO. 19 (Yeas 86 - Nays 55 - Absent 8 - Excused 1 Vacant 1)
2019-03-26HouseOn motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-03-26HouseReports READ.
2019-03-21SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2019-03-21SenateREAD A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-11)
2019-03-21SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2019-03-19SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2019-03-19SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-11) READ and ADOPTED
2019-03-19SenateREAD ONCE
2019-03-19SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 25 Yeas 20 - Nays 13 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
2019-03-19SenateOn motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2019-03-19SenateReports Read
2019-01-15HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-15HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING.
2019-01-15SenateCommittee on LABOR AND HOUSING suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback