ME LD777 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Establish the Permanent Commission on the Status of Racial, Indigenous and Maine Tribal Populations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Establish the Permanent Commission on the Status of Racial, Indigenous and Maine Tribal Populations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-10 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #240 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-11HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-11HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-10SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-493) in concurrence
2019-06-10SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-493) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-10SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-10SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 240 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-06-10SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2019-06-10SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-06-10SenateOn further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report,
2019-06-10SenateSenator BELLOWS of Kennebec moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2019-06-10SenateReports READ
2019-06-07HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-07HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-493).
2019-06-07HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-07HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-493) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-07HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-06-07HouseOn motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-07HouseReports READ.
2019-04-16SenateREFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence
2019-04-16SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
2019-04-11HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-11HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING
2019-04-11HouseReport was READ and ACCEPTED.
2019-04-11HouseRepresentative MARTIN from the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT Reporting that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING.
2019-02-14SenateOn motion by Senator Claxton of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on State and Local Government, in concurrence.
2019-02-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-12HouseOn motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
2019-02-12HouseCommittee on LABOR AND HOUSING suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback