ME LD832 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Expand Options for Consumers of Cable Television in Purchasing Individual Channels and Programs
Title
An Act To Expand Options for Consumers of Cable Television in Purchasing Individual Channels and Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #146 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-28 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #132 (Y: 94 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #132 (Y: 94 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2019-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence |
2019-05-29 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 146 Yeas 14 - Nays 21 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York to Accept the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2019-05-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-28 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 132 (Yeas 94 - Nays 45 - Absent 9 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-05-28 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence |
2019-02-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |