ME LD857 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Accountability for Wage Violations
Title
An Act To Increase Accountability for Wage Violations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #43 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #43 (Y: 84 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #43 (Y: 84 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-78) in concurrence |
2019-04-16 | Senate | READ and ADOPTED Committee Amendment "A" (H-78) in concurrence |
2019-04-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 43 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-78). |
2019-04-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-78) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-04-11 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-04-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 43 (Yeas 84 - Nays 54 - Absent 11 - Excused 1 Vacant 1) |
2019-04-11 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence |
2019-02-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed. |