ME LD900 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Expand the Rights of Public Employees under the Maine Labor Laws
Title
An Act To Expand the Rights of Public Employees under the Maine Labor Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-03-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-03-10 | House | Later today assigned. |
2020-03-10 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2020-03-10 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence |
2019-02-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2019-02-19 | House | Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=900&snum=129 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0664&item=1&snum=129 |