ME LD904 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Commissioner of Professional and Financial Regulation To Conduct a Sunrise Review Regarding the Proposal To License Operators of Cranes
Title
Resolve, Directing the Commissioner of Professional and Financial Regulation To Conduct a Sunrise Review Regarding the Proposal To License Operators of Cranes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-07 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #223 (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-10 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-465) in concurrence |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-465) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 223 Yeas 18 - Nays 14 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator HERBIG of Waldo the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-06 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-465). |
2019-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-06 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-465) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-06 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-06 | House | On motion of Representative DAUGHTRY of Brunswick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-06 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS in concurrence |
2019-02-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-19 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2019-02-19 | House | Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business suggested and ordered printed. |