ME LD915 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Adequate Reimbursement under MaineCare for Ambulance and Neonatal Transport Services
Title
An Act To Provide Adequate Reimbursement under MaineCare for Ambulance and Neonatal Transport Services
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Sen. Ned Claxton [D] | Rep. Kathleen Dillingham [R] | Sen. Lisa Keim [R] |
Rep. Dennis Keschl [R] | Rep. John Martin [D] | Rep. Roland Martin [D] | Sen. Marianne Moore [R] |
Rep. Anne Perry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-21 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-104). |
2019-05-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-21 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-104). |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-104) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-02-19 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |