ME LD940 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase the Number of Franklin County Commissioners
Title
An Act To Increase the Number of Franklin County Commissioners
Sponsors
Rep. Christina Riley [D] | Sen. Russell Black [R] | Rep. Randall Hall [R] | Rep. Frances Head [R] |
Rep. Scott Landry [D] | Rep. Thomas Skolfield [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-13 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-13 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-488) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-266) thereto. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-488) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-266) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-488) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-266) thereto ADOPTED |
2019-06-12 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-266) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-488) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-488) was ADOPTED |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-488) |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was ENACTED |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION |
2019-06-12 | Senate | RECALLED From Governor's Desk pursuant to Joint Order SP 624. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-488), in concurrence. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-488) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-488). |
2019-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-06 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2019-02-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2019-02-21 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |