ME LD945 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Establish the Blue Ribbon Commission To Study and Recommend Funding Solutions for the State's Transportation Systems
Title
Resolve, To Establish the Blue Ribbon Commission To Study and Recommend Funding Solutions for the State's Transportation Systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2019-06-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-20 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-06-20 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2019-06-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-557) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-353) thereto. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-557) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-353) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-557) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-353) thereto ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-353) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-557) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-557) was ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-557) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2019-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-12 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-06-12 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-557), in concurrence. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-557) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-557). |
2019-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2019-02-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2019-02-21 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |