ME LD96 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require Disclosure at the Sale or Transfer whether Methamphetamine Is Present or Has Been Removed from Real Estate
Title
An Act To Require Disclosure at the Sale or Transfer whether Methamphetamine Is Present or Has Been Removed from Real Estate
Sponsors
Rep. Anne-Marie Mastraccio [D] | Sen. Anne Carney [D] | Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] | Rep. Deane Rykerson [D] |
Rep. John Schneck [D] | Rep. Michael Sylvester [D] | Rep. David Woodsome [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-03 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-386), in concurrence. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-386) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-386). |
2019-05-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-30 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Subsequently On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-01-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-15 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2019-01-15 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |