MI HB4014 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred To Committee On Oversight
Pending: Senate Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred To Committee On Oversight
Pending: Senate Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Civil rights: other; access to public record search under legislative open records act (LORA); provide for. Amends 1976 PA 442 (MCL 15.231 - 15.246) by adding sec. 55. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4011'19
Title
Civil rights: other; access to public record search under legislative open records act (LORA); provide for. Amends 1976 PA 442 (MCL 15.231 - 15.246) by adding sec. 55. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4011'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 36 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2019-04-09 | House | Transmitted |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 36 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-04-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/09/2019 |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2019-03-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Andrea Schroeder |