MI HB4055 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Assigned Pa 23'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Land use; land division; tax payment certification or tax apportionment; require prior to approval of land division. Amends sec. 109 of 1967 PA 288 (MCL 560.109).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land use; land division; tax payment certification or tax apportionment; require prior to approval of land division. Amends sec. 109 of 1967 PA 288 (MCL 560.109).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 123 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 20 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18HouseAssigned Pa 23'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-06-18HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 6/18/2019 @ 1:40 Pm
2019-06-18HouseApproved By The Governor 6/18/2019 @ 11:21 Am
2019-06-06HousePresented To The Governor 6/6/2019 @ 9:24 Am
2019-06-04HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2019-06-04HouseFull Title Agreed To
2019-06-04HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2019-06-04SenateInserted Full Title
2019-06-04SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 123 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2019-05-22SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2019-05-22SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2019-05-21SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-05-21SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-05-21SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-03-20SenateReferred To Committee On Local Government
2019-03-19HouseTransmitted
2019-03-19HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 20 Yeas 107 Nays 0
2019-03-19HouseRead A Third Time
2019-03-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-03-13HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted
2019-03-13HouseRead A Second Time
2019-03-12HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-03-12HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2
2019-02-27HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With H-2
2019-01-17HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/16/2018
2019-01-16HouseReferred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
2019-01-16HouseRead A First Time
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced By Representative Bradley Slagh

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4055
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4055.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4055.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4055.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4055.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0023.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-03-12-025.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-03-19-028.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-05-21-049.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-06-04-056.htm

Bill Comments

feedback