MI HB4061 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-24)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Assigned Pa 4'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-24)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Assigned Pa 4'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways: memorial; portion of M-53; designate as the "Chief Petty Officer Jason Freiwald Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 20.2080) by adding sec. 21b.
Title
Highways: memorial; portion of M-53; designate as the "Chief Petty Officer Jason Freiwald Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 20.2080) by adding sec. 21b.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 7 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 7 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | House | Assigned Pa 4'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-04-16 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 04/24/2019 01:32 Pm |
2019-04-16 | House | Approved By The Governor 04/24/2019 12:31 Pm |
2019-04-16 | House | Presented To The Governor 04/12/2019 01:56 Pm |
2019-04-09 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-04-09 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2019-02-28 | House | Transmitted |
2019-02-28 | House | Title Amended |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 7 Yeas 110 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-02-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-02-27 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2019-02-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-01-17 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/17/2019 |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2019-01-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeff Yaroch |