MI HB4066 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Assigned Pa 19'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Fire; other; requirement for manual fire alarm box in schools; exempt in certain circumstances. Amends 1941 PA 207 (MCL 29.1 - 29.33) by adding sec. 3d.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fire; other; requirement for manual fire alarm box in schools; exempt in certain circumstances. Amends 1941 PA 207 (MCL 29.1 - 29.33) by adding sec. 3d.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 119 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 11 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11HouseAssigned Pa 19'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-06-11HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 6/7/2019 @ 10:06 Am
2019-06-11HouseApproved By The Governor 6/7/2019 @ 9:21 Am
2019-05-24HousePresented To The Governor 5/24/2019 @ 2:06 Pm
2019-05-22HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2019-05-22HouseFull Title Agreed To
2019-05-22HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2019-05-22SenateInserted Full Title
2019-05-22SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 119 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-05-21SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2019-05-21SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2019-05-15SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-05-15SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-05-15SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-03-12SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2019-03-07HouseTransmitted
2019-03-07HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 11 Yeas 105 Nays 0
2019-03-07HouseRead A Third Time
2019-03-06HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-03-06HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2019-03-06HouseRead A Second Time
2019-03-05HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-03-05HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2019-02-26HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With H-1
2019-01-22HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/17/2019
2019-01-17HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2019-01-17HouseRead A First Time
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced By Representative Julie Calley

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4066
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4066.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4066.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4066.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4066.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0019.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-03-05-022.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-03-07-024.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-05-15-047.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-05-22-050.htm

Bill Comments

feedback