MI HB4069 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Transmitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Property tax; assessments; placement of solar panels on residential real property; exclude from assessment of true cash value. Amends secs. 27 & 34d of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.27 & 211.34d). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4068'19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax; assessments; placement of solar panels on residential real property; exclude from assessment of true cash value. Amends secs. 27 & 34d of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.27 & 211.34d). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4068'19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 172 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseTransmitted
2019-06-20HouseTitle Amended
2019-06-20HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 172 Yeas 106 Nays 3
2019-06-20HouseRead A Third Time
2019-06-19HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-06-19HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted
2019-06-19HouseRead A Second Time
2019-06-19HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-06-19HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2
2019-04-24HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With H-1
2019-01-22HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/17/2019
2019-01-17HouseReferred To Committee On Tax Policy
2019-01-17HouseRead A First Time
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced By Representative Bronna Kahle

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback