MI HB4077 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Assigned Pa 44'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Economic development; other; commercial rehabilitation certificates; modify under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 6 & 8 of 2005 PA 210 (MCL 207.846 & 207.848).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic development; other; commercial rehabilitation certificates; modify under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 6 & 8 of 2005 PA 210 (MCL 207.846 & 207.848).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 157 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 32 (Y: 102 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10HouseAssigned Pa 44'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-07-10HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 7/8/2019 @ 2:18 Pm
2019-07-10HouseApproved By The Governor 7/8/2019 @ 8:38 Am
2019-06-26HousePresented To The Governor 6/24/2019 @ 4:21 Pm
2019-06-19HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2019-06-19HouseFull Title Agreed To
2019-06-19HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2019-06-19SenateInserted Full Title
2019-06-19SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 157 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2019-06-19SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-06-19SenateRules Suspended
2019-06-19SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2019-06-19SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2019-04-30SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-04-30SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-04-30SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-03-21SenateReferred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development
2019-03-20HouseTransmitted
2019-03-20HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 32 Yeas 102 Nays 4
2019-03-20HouseRead A Third Time
2019-03-19HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-03-19HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted
2019-03-19HouseRead A Second Time
2019-03-12HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-03-12HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2
2019-02-28HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With H-2
2019-01-24HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/23/2019
2019-01-23HouseReferred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism
2019-01-23HouseRead A First Time
2019-01-23HouseIntroduced By Representative Sheldon Neeley

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4077
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4077.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4077.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4077.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4077.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0044.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-03-12-025.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-03-20-029.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-04-30-040.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-06-19-063.htm

Bill Comments

feedback