MI HB4098 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 16 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-31 - Pocket Veto 01/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 16 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-31 - Pocket Veto 01/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Health facilities: other; registration as a medication aide and permits for medication aide trainers and training programs; provide for. Amends secs. 21903, 21905, 21907, 21909, 21911, 21913, 21915, 21919, 21921 & 21923 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.21903 et seq.).
Title
Health facilities: other; registration as a medication aide and permits for medication aide trainers and training programs; provide for. Amends secs. 21903, 21905, 21907, 21909, 21911, 21913, 21915, 21919, 21921 & 21923 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.21903 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-16 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 550 (Y: 56 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 518 (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 415 (Y: 55 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 518 (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 415 (Y: 55 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | House | Pocket Veto 01/05/2021 |
2020-12-23 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/22/2020 04:57 Pm |
2020-12-16 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-16 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-16 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 550 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-12-16 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-12-15 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-12-15 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Full Title |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 518 Yeas 22 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-11-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-11-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-11-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2020-09-23 | House | Transmitted |
2020-09-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 415 Yeas 55 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-09-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-09-23 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-09-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-23 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2020-09-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-09-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2020-09-16 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-09-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-15 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2020-09-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-09-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-09-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-09-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/29/2019 |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2019-01-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Ben Frederick |
Subjects
Health facilities: other
Health occupations: nursing assistants
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Health occupations: nursing assistants
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs