MI HB4101 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Assigned Pa 29'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Economic development; downtown development authorities; membership appointed to the downtown development authority board; modify. Amends sec. 204 of 2018 PA 57 (MCL 125.4204).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic development; downtown development authorities; membership appointed to the downtown development authority board; modify. Amends sec. 204 of 2018 PA 57 (MCL 125.4204).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 131 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 8 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26HouseAssigned Pa 29'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-06-26HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 6/25/2019 @ 10:26 Am
2019-06-26HouseApproved By The Governor 6/25/2019 @ 9:00 Am
2019-06-19HousePresented To The Governor 6/19/2019 @ 2:22 Pm
2019-06-12HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2019-06-12HouseFull Title Agreed To
2019-06-12HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2019-06-12SenateInserted Full Title
2019-06-12SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 131 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2019-06-11SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2019-06-11SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2019-04-30SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-04-30SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-04-30SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-03-06SenateReferred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development
2019-03-05HouseTransmitted
2019-03-05HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 8 Yeas 108 Nays 0
2019-03-05HouseRead A Third Time
2019-02-28HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-02-28HouseRead A Second Time
2019-02-26HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-02-26HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2019-02-13HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means
2019-02-05HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/29/2019
2019-01-29HouseReferred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
2019-01-29HouseRead A First Time
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced By Representative Ben Frederick

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4101
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4101.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4101.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4101.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4101.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0029.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-02-26-019.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-03-05-022.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-04-30-040.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-06-12-060.htm

Bill Comments

feedback