MI HB4108 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Veterans
Pending: Senate Families, Seniors And Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Veterans
Pending: Senate Families, Seniors And Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Children; protection; mandatory reporting requirements for child abuse or child neglect; expand to include physical therapist and physical therapist assistant. Amends sec. 3 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.623).
Title
Children; protection; mandatory reporting requirements for child abuse or child neglect; expand to include physical therapist and physical therapist assistant. Amends sec. 3 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.623).
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Hauck [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Griffin [R] | Rep. Jim Ellison [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Yaroch [R] |
Rep. John Chirkun [D] | Rep. Larry Inman [R] | Rep. Sheryl Kennedy [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 149 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Veterans |
2019-06-19 | House | Transmitted |
2019-06-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 149 Yeas 107 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-06-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-06-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-06-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-06-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/29/2019 |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2019-01-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Roger Hauck |
Subjects
Children: child abuse or child neglect
Children: protection
Health occupations: physical therapist assistants
Health occupations: physical therapists
Children: protection
Health occupations: physical therapist assistants
Health occupations: physical therapists