MI HB4118 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Assigned Pa 31'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Assigned Pa 31'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; speed restrictions; procedure for establishing certain speed limits; modify, and make other revisions. Amends sec. 627 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.627).
Title
Traffic control; speed restrictions; procedure for establishing certain speed limits; modify, and make other revisions. Amends sec. 627 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.627).
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Slagh [R] | Rep. Jim Ellison [D] | Rep. Douglas Wozniak [R] | Rep. Brad Paquette [R] |
Rep. Julie Brixie [D] | Rep. Karen Whitsett [D] | Rep. John Chirkun [D] | Rep. Nate Shannon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 139 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 53 (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 53 (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Assigned Pa 31'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-06-26 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/25/2019 10:30 Am |
2019-06-26 | House | Approved By The Governor 06/25/2019 09:06 Am |
2019-07-02 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/20/2019 01:55 Pm |
2019-06-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-06-18 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-06-18 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 139 Yeas 33 Nays 4 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2019-04-23 | House | Transmitted |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 53 Yeas 106 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-04-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-04-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/29/2019 |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2019-01-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Bradley Slagh |
Subjects
State agencies (existing): transportation
Traffic control: speed restrictions
Traffic control: traffic regulation
Traffic control: speed restrictions
Traffic control: traffic regulation