MI HB4121 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Assigned Pa 35'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Property tax; delinquent taxes; authority of county treasurers to enter tax foreclosure avoidance agreements; extend sunset. Amends sec. 78q of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.78q).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax; delinquent taxes; authority of county treasurers to enter tax foreclosure avoidance agreements; extend sunset. Amends sec. 78q of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.78q).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 167 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 153 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 45 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02HouseAssigned Pa 35'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-07-02HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 6/26/2019 @ 3:22 Pm
2019-07-02HouseApproved By The Governor 6/26/2019 @ 1:33 Pm
2019-06-26HousePresented To The Governor 6/24/2019 @ 4:17 Pm
2019-06-20HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2019-06-20HouseFull Title Agreed To
2019-06-20House Roll Call # 167 Yeas 109 Nays 0
2019-06-20HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Concurred In
2019-06-19HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2019-06-19HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2019-06-19SenateInserted Full Title
2019-06-19SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 153 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2019-06-18SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2019-06-18SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2019-06-18SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2019-05-23SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2019-05-23SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-05-23SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2019-04-16SenateReferred To Committee On Finance
2019-04-11HouseTransmitted
2019-04-11HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 45 Yeas 110 Nays 0
2019-04-11HouseRead A Third Time
2019-04-10HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-04-10HouseRead A Second Time
2019-04-09HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-04-09HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2019-03-20HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means
2019-02-06HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/05/2019
2019-02-05HouseReferred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
2019-02-05HouseRead A First Time
2019-02-05HouseIntroduced By Representative Wendell Byrd

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4121
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4121.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4121.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4121.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4121.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0035.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-04-09-031.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-04-11-033.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-05-23-051.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-06-19-063.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-06-20-064.htm

Bill Comments

feedback