MI HB4128 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Courts; probate court; parental consent required for name change; modify under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 1, ch. XI of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 711.1).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts; probate court; parental consent required for name change; modify under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 1, ch. XI of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 711.1).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12HouseReported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means
2019-02-06HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/05/2019
2019-02-05HouseReferred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
2019-02-05HouseRead A First Time
2019-02-05HouseIntroduced By Representative Aaron Miller

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback