MI HB4136 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Approved By The Governor 12/28/2016 @ 10:53 Am
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Approved By The Governor 12/28/2016 @ 10:53 Am
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; examinations; high school competency requirement; include a civics component. Amends sec. 1166 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 350.1166).
Title
Education; examinations; high school competency requirement; include a civics component. Amends sec. 1166 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 350.1166).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-15 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 753 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 816 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 337 (Y: 82 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 816 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 337 (Y: 82 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/28/2016 @ 10:53 Am |
2016-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 391'16 |
2016-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2016 @ 1:42 Pm |
2016-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/28/2016 @ 10:53 Am |
2016-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/21/2016 @ 3:52 Pm |
2016-12-15 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-15 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-15 | House | Roll Call # 753 Yeas 105 Nays 2 |
2016-12-15 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-12-15 | House | Rule Suspended |
2016-12-15 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2016-12-15 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Full Title |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 816 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2016-05-31 | House | Transmitted |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 337 Yeas 82 Nays 27 |
2016-05-31 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-05-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-05-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-04-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-02-04 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/04/2015 |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2015-02-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-02-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Peter Lucido |