MI HB4146 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-10 - Reassigned To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-10 - Reassigned To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles: criminal procedure; raise the age fund; provide for. Amends 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.1 - 400.119b) by adding sec. 117i.
Title
Juveniles: criminal procedure; raise the age fund; provide for. Amends 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.1 - 400.119b) by adding sec. 117i.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 70 (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 70 (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-10 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-04-25 | House | Transmitted |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 70 Yeas 106 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-04-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-04-24 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2019-04-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/06/2019 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Mary Whiteford |