MI HB4152 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Assigned Pa 53'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Assigned Pa 53'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Records; birth; fees and procedure to obtain birth certificate; modify for certain individuals. Amends sec. 2891 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2891). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4153'19
Title
Records; birth; fees and procedure to obtain birth certificate; modify for certain individuals. Amends sec. 2891 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2891). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4153'19
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Johnson [R] | Rep. Vanessa Guerra [D] | Rep. Leslie Love [D] | Rep. Gary Howell [R] |
Rep. Tommy Brann [R] | Rep. Cara Clemente [D] | Rep. Beau LaFave [R] | Rep. Cynthia Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 83 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 65 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 48 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 75 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 65 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 48 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 75 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned Pa 53'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-03-04 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/03/2020 04:18 Pm |
2020-03-04 | House | Approved By The Governor 03/03/2020 12:53 Pm |
2020-02-25 | House | Presented To The Governor 02/24/2020 02:17 Pm |
2020-02-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-02-20 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 83 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-02-20 | House | Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2020-02-20 | House | Enrollment Vacated |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-02-19 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2020-02-19 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 65 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2020-02-19 | House | Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2020-02-18 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Title Amended |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 48 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) As Amended |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) As Amended Concurred In |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) And Amendment(s) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Veterans |
2019-04-30 | House | Transmitted |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 75 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-04-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-04-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-04-25 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2019-04-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-02-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/06/2019 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2019-02-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Steven Johnson |