MI HB4173 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 159'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 159'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Gaming; bingo and charitable gaming; general amendments relating to millionaire parties; provide for. Amends secs. 2, 3, 3a, 4, 4a, 8, 9, 10, 11b, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 18 & 19 of 1972 PA 382 (MCL 432.102 et seq.); adds art. 2 & repeals secs. 10a, 10b, 17 & 20 of 1972 PA 382 (MCL 432.110a et seq.).
Title
Gaming; bingo and charitable gaming; general amendments relating to millionaire parties; provide for. Amends secs. 2, 3, 3a, 4, 4a, 8, 9, 10, 11b, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 18 & 19 of 1972 PA 382 (MCL 432.102 et seq.); adds art. 2 & repeals secs. 10a, 10b, 17 & 20 of 1972 PA 382 (MCL 432.110a et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 364 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 351 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 350 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 297 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 351 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 350 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 297 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 159'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/20/2019 11:02 Am |
2019-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/20/2019 10:12 Am |
2019-12-19 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/13/2019 03:09 Pm |
2019-12-11 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-12-11 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-12-11 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 364 Yeas 105 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-12-11 | House | Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2019-12-11 | House | Rule Suspended |
2019-12-11 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2019-12-11 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 351 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 350 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-10-30 | House | Transmitted |
2019-10-30 | House | Title Amended |
2019-10-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 297 Yeas 104 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2019-10-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-10-30 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-10-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-10-30 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2019-10-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-10-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/14/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-02-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced By Representative John Chirkun |