MI HB4205 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 602'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 602'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative procedure; rules; adoption of rules by state agencies; prohibit from being more stringent than federal regulations. Amends secs. 32 & 45 of 1969 PA 306 (MCL 24.232 & 24.245).
Title
Administrative procedure; rules; adoption of rules by state agencies; prohibit from being more stringent than federal regulations. Amends secs. 32 & 45 of 1969 PA 306 (MCL 24.232 & 24.245).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 831 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 820 (Y: 57 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 778 (Y: 57 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 681 (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 121 (Y: 57 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 820 (Y: 57 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 778 (Y: 57 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 681 (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 121 (Y: 57 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 602'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 5:16 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/28/2018 @ 1:45 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/21/2018 @ 2:58 Pm |
2018-12-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-18 | House | Re-returned From Senate With Concurrence To House Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Roll Call # 831 Yeas 23 Nays 14 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-13 | Senate | House Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Returned From House With Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-12 | House | Retransmitted |
2018-12-12 | House | Roll Call # 820 Yeas 57 Nays 52 |
2018-12-12 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In As Amended |
2018-12-12 | House | Amended |
2018-12-12 | House | Vote On Passage Reconsidered |
2018-12-12 | House | Enrollment Vacated |
2018-12-11 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-11 | House | Rep. Sue Allor Removed As Cosponsor |
2018-12-11 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-11 | House | Roll Call # 778 Yeas 57 Nays 51 |
2018-12-11 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-06 | House | Postponed Temporarily |
2018-12-05 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-05 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 681 Yeas 24 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2017-05-18 | House | Transmitted |
2017-05-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 121 Yeas 57 Nays 50 |
2017-05-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-05-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-05-17 | House | Amended |
2017-05-17 | House | Substitute H-3 Not Adopted |
2017-05-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2017-02-15 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/14/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2017-02-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Triston Cole |