MI HB4225 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Assigned Pa 43'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health occupations; health professionals; prescribers to obtain a Michigan Automated Prescription System (MAPS) report before prescribing or dispensing a controlled substance; provide exemption for hospice, and exempt hospice patients from bona fide prescriber-patient relationship requirement for prescribing a controlled substance. Amends sec. 7303a of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7303a). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0128'19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health occupations; health professionals; prescribers to obtain a Michigan Automated Prescription System (MAPS) report before prescribing or dispensing a controlled substance; provide exemption for hospice, and exempt hospice patients from bona fide prescriber-patient relationship requirement for prescribing a controlled substance. Amends sec. 7303a of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7303a). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0128'19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 168 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 156 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 47 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10HouseAssigned Pa 43'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-07-10HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 7/8/2019 @ 2:16 Pm
2019-07-10HouseApproved By The Governor 7/8/2019 @ 8:42 Am
2019-06-26HousePresented To The Governor 6/25/2019 @ 1:24 Pm
2019-06-20HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2019-06-20HouseFull Title Agreed To
2019-06-20House Roll Call # 168 Yeas 109 Nays 0
2019-06-20HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Concurred In
2019-06-19HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2019-06-19HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2019-06-19SenateInserted Full Title
2019-06-19SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 156 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2019-06-19SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-06-19SenateRules Suspended
2019-06-19SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2019-06-19SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2019-06-19SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2019-05-21SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2019-05-21SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-05-21SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2019-04-16SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
2019-04-11HouseTransmitted
2019-04-11HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 47 Yeas 110 Nays 0
2019-04-11HouseRead A Third Time
2019-04-10HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-04-10HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseRead A Second Time
2019-04-09HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-04-09HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2
2019-03-14HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With H-1
2019-02-26HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/21/2019
2019-02-21HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2019-02-21HouseRead A First Time
2019-02-21HouseIntroduced By Representative Bronna Kahle

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4225
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4225.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4225.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4225.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4225.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0043.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-04-09-031.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-04-11-033.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-05-21-049.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-06-19-063.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-06-20-064.htm

Bill Comments

feedback