MI HB4227 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Assigned Pa 47'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Natural resources; mining; committee on mining future; create as advisory body. Creates & repeals new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural resources; mining; committee on mining future; create as advisory body. Creates & repeals new act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 169 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 152 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 92 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10HouseAssigned Pa 47'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-07-10HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 7/8/2019 @ 2:24 Pm
2019-07-10HouseApproved By The Governor 7/8/2019 @ 8:32 Am
2019-06-26HousePresented To The Governor 6/24/2019 @ 4:11 Pm
2019-06-20HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2019-06-20House Roll Call # 169 Yeas 108 Nays 1
2019-06-20HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Concurred In
2019-06-19HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2019-06-19HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect
2019-06-19SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 152 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2019-06-18SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2019-06-18SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2019-06-18SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2019-05-23SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2019-05-23SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-05-23SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2019-05-21SenateReferred To Committee On Natural Resources
2019-05-16HouseTransmitted
2019-05-16HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 92 Yeas 107 Nays 1
2019-05-16HouseRead A Third Time
2019-05-15HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-05-15HouseSubstitute H-3 Adopted
2019-05-15HouseRead A Second Time
2019-05-14HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-05-14HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3
2019-04-16HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With H-3
2019-02-26HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/21/2019
2019-02-21HouseReferred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation
2019-02-21HouseRead A First Time
2019-02-21HouseIntroduced By Representative Sara Cambensy

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4227
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4227.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4227.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4227.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4227.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0047.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-05-14-046.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-05-16-048.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-05-23-051.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-06-19-063.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-06-20-064.htm

Bill Comments

feedback