MI HB4230 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations; zero budget; community colleges; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Amends secs. 201 & 201a of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1801 & 388.1801a).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations; zero budget; community colleges; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Amends secs. 201 & 201a of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1801 & 388.1801a).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 119 (Y: 57 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-06-13SenateRules Suspended
2019-06-12HouseTransmitted
2019-06-12HousePassed Roll Call # 119 Yeas 57 Nays 50
2019-06-12HouseRead A Third Time
2019-06-12HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-06-12HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-06-12HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2019-06-12HouseRead A Second Time
2019-05-16HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-05-16HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2019-02-27HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/26/2019
2019-02-26HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2019-02-26HouseRead A First Time
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced By Representative Scott Vansingel

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback