MI HB4231 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Referred To Conference Committee 06/20/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations; zero budget; department of corrections; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Creates appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations; zero budget; department of corrections; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Creates appropriation act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 136 (Y: 0 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 145 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 116 (Y: 56 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseReferred To Conference Committee 06/20/2019
2019-06-20HouseSenate Conferees Named 06/20/2019: Sens. Tom Barrett Jim Stamas Adam Hollier
2019-06-20SenateReferred To Conference Committee
2019-06-20SenateSenate Named Conferees 06/20/2019: Sens. Tom Barrett, Jim Stamas, Adam Hollier
2019-06-19HouseHouse Conferees Named 06/19/2019: Reps. Thomas Albert Bradley Slagh Kristy Pagan
2019-06-19House Roll Call # 136 Yeas 0 Nays 109
2019-06-19HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Nonconcurred In
2019-06-18HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2019-06-18HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1
2019-06-18SenatePassed Roll Call # 145 Yeas 22 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2019-06-18SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-06-18SenateRules Suspended
2019-06-18SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2019-06-18SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2019-06-18SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2019-06-13SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-06-13SenateRules Suspended
2019-06-11HouseTransmitted
2019-06-11HousePassed Roll Call # 116 Yeas 56 Nays 51
2019-06-11HouseRead A Third Time
2019-06-11HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-06-11HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-06-11HouseSubstitute H-3 Adopted And Amended
2019-06-11HouseRead A Second Time
2019-06-06HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-06-06HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3
2019-02-27HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/26/2019
2019-02-26HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2019-02-26HouseRead A First Time
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced By Representative Thomas Albert

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback