MI HB4232 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Referred To Conference Committee 06/20/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations; zero budget; department of education; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Creates appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations; zero budget; department of education; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Creates appropriation act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseReferred To Conference Committee 06/20/2019
2019-06-20HouseSenate Conferees Named 06/20/2019: Sens. Wayne Schmidt Jim Stamas Rosemary Bayer
2019-06-20SenateReferred To Conference Committee
2019-06-20SenateSenate Named Conferees 06/20/2019: Sens. Wayne Schmidt, Jim Stamas, Rosemary Bayer
2019-06-19HouseHouse Conferees Named 06/19/2019: Reps. Aaron Miller Pamela Hornberger Kristy Pagan
2019-06-19House Roll Call # 137 Yeas 0 Nays 109
2019-06-19HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Nonconcurred In
2019-06-18HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2019-06-18HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1
2019-06-18SenatePassed Roll Call # 146 Yeas 22 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2019-06-18SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-06-18SenateRules Suspended
2019-06-18SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2019-06-18SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2019-06-18SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2019-06-18SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-06-18SenateRules Suspended
2019-06-13HouseTransmitted
2019-06-13HousePassed Roll Call # 124 Yeas 58 Nays 51
2019-06-13HouseRead A Third Time
2019-06-13HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-06-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-06-13HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted And Amended
2019-06-13HouseRead A Second Time
2019-05-14HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-05-14HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2
2019-02-27HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/26/2019
2019-02-26HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2019-02-26HouseRead A First Time
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced By Representative Aaron Miller

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback