MI HB4234 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Assigned Pa 45'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations; zero budget; supplemental; provide for fiscal year 2018-2019. Creates appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations; zero budget; supplemental; provide for fiscal year 2018-2019. Creates appropriation act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 163 (Y: 99 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 159 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 120 (Y: 59 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10HouseAssigned Pa 45'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-07-10HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 7/8/2019 @ 2:20 Pm
2019-07-10HouseApproved By The Governor 7/8/2019 @ 8:34 Am
2019-06-26HousePresented To The Governor 6/24/2019 @ 4:13 Pm
2019-06-20HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2019-06-20HouseTitle Amendment Agreed To
2019-06-20HouseGiven Immediate Effect
2019-06-20House Roll Call # 163 Yeas 99 Nays 6
2019-06-20HouseSenate Substitute S-3 Concurred In
2019-06-20HouseRule Suspended
2019-06-20HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2019-06-20HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-3 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment
2019-06-20SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 159 Yeas 34 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 2
2019-06-20SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-06-20SenateRules Suspended
2019-06-20SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3
2019-06-20SenateSubstitute S-3 Concurred In
2019-06-20SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3
2019-06-13SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-06-13SenateRules Suspended
2019-06-12HouseTransmitted
2019-06-12HousePassed Roll Call # 120 Yeas 59 Nays 48
2019-06-12HouseRead A Third Time
2019-06-12HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-06-12HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-06-12HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted And Amended
2019-06-12HouseRead A Second Time
2019-05-23HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-05-23HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2
2019-02-27HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/26/2019
2019-02-26HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2019-02-26HouseRead A First Time
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced By Representative Mark Huizenga

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4234
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4234.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4234.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4234.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4234.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0045.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-05-23-051.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-06-12-060.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-06-20-064.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-06-20-064.htm

Bill Comments

feedback