MI HB4236 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Disapproved Line Item(s) Re-referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Disapproved Line Item(s) Re-referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations: higher education; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Amends secs. 236, 236a, 236b, 236c, 237, 241, 245, 245a, 251, 252, 256, 263, 263a, 264, 265, 265a, 265b, 265c, 265d, 267, 268, 269, 270, 274, 274c, 276, 277, 278, 279, 280, 281, 282, 283, & 289 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1836 et seq.) & adds sec. 275d.
Title
Appropriations: higher education; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Amends secs. 236, 236a, 236b, 236c, 237, 241, 245, 245a, 251, 252, 256, 263, 263a, 264, 265, 265a, 265b, 265c, 265d, 267, 268, 269, 270, 274, 274c, 276, 277, 278, 279, 280, 281, 282, 283, & 289 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1836 et seq.) & adds sec. 275d.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Senate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 239 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 238 (Y: 58 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 139 (Y: 0 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 138 (Y: 1 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 143 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 129 (Y: 56 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 238 (Y: 58 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 139 (Y: 0 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 138 (Y: 1 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 143 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 129 (Y: 56 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | House | Disapproved Line Item(s) Re-referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2019-10-02 | House | Postponed For The Day |
2019-10-02 | House | Assigned Pa 62'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-10-02 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 09/30/2019 07:30 Pm |
2019-10-02 | House | Approved By The Governor With Line Item(s) Vetoed 09/29/2019 03:35 Pm |
2019-09-26 | House | Presented To The Governor 09/27/2019 09:14 Am |
2019-09-24 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-09-24 | House | Conference Report Adopted By Senate With Immediate Effect |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Senate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 239 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Conference Report Received In Senate |
2019-09-24 | House | Retransmitted |
2019-09-24 | House | Given Immediate Effect |
2019-09-24 | House | Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 238 Yeas 58 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-09-17 | House | Conference Report Received |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Senate Named Conferees 06/20/2019: Sens. Kimberly Lasata, Jim Stamas, Jeff Irwin |
2019-06-19 | House | House Conferees Named 06/19/2019: Reps. Scott A Vansingel Ann Bollin Sarah Anthony |
2019-06-19 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 139 Yeas 0 Nays 108 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-06-19 | House | Vote Reconsidered |
2019-06-19 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 138 Yeas 1 Nays 108 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-06-19 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Nonconcurred In |
2019-06-18 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2019-06-18 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Title Amendment |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 143 Yeas 22 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-06-13 | House | Transmitted |
2019-06-13 | House | Title Amended |
2019-06-13 | House | Passed Roll Call # 129 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-06-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-06-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-06-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-06-13 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2019-06-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-06-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-02-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/26/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2019-02-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Scott Vansingel |