MI HB4237 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 564'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 564'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Communications; other; authorized use of Michigan public safety communications system; expand. Amends title & secs. 1, 2 & 3 of 1929 PA 152 (MCL 28.281 et seq.).
Title
Communications; other; authorized use of Michigan public safety communications system; expand. Amends title & secs. 1, 2 & 3 of 1929 PA 152 (MCL 28.281 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 758 (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 823 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-09 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 644 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 823 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-09 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 644 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 564'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/15/2015 @ 2:58 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/10/2015 @ 2:44 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/2/2015 @ 11:42 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-18 | House | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-18 | House | Roll Call # 758 Yeas 108 Nays 2 |
2014-12-18 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-17 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-12-17 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 823 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 1 |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2014-12-09 | House | Transmitted |
2014-12-09 | House | Passed Roll Call # 644 Yeas 107 Nays 2 |
2014-12-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-09 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-09 | House | Substitute H-4 Adopted |
2014-12-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 |
2013-02-13 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/13/2013 |
2013-02-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2013-02-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-02-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Gail Haines |