MI HB4240 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Re-referred To Committee On Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations; zero budget; department of military and veterans affairs; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Creates appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations; zero budget; department of military and veterans affairs; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Creates appropriation act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11HouseRe-referred To Committee On Appropriations
2019-05-14HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-05-14HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5
2019-02-27HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/26/2019
2019-02-26HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2019-02-26HouseRead A First Time
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced By Representative Larry Inman

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback